Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Douglas, Dorothy, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Youngblood, Terrell Patton, against The Fernandina Beach Church Of, represented by Coulson, Michael Irwin, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2009 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REC | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION NON CLOSING | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: NOTICE | |
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ORD: APPOINTING MEDIATOR | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: ANSWERING INTERROGATORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.