Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davis, Alvin Jerome Sr, Davis, Jacquelyn, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Penland, Samuel Perry, against M Lisante Enterprises Inc, represented by Ramsey, Richard Edward, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2009 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REC | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: NOTICE | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.