Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First Coast Community Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Kosmic Kafe Llc, Griffin, Jennifer D, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: CERTIFY/COPIES CICV | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | AFF: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS/RTD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.