Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Power Solutions Electric Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Henderson, Reese John, against Amelia River Plantation Llc, The Rt Morris Company, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE | |
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: COPIES CICV | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS/RTD | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.