Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brinkley, Ronald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pajcic, Curtis Stephen, against Pickett, Angela, Hartford Insurance Company Of, Pickett, Matt Steven, represented by Taylor, Debra Carter, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: ANSWERING INTERROGATORY | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO RQST/PRODUCTION | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF SERVICE | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: OF LIS PENDENS REC | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | NOT: NOTICE | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD: APPOINTING MEDIATOR | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.