Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Buchanan, Clayton, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bryan, Mark Craig, against Aj Mobile Marine Llc, Sims, Randall, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2008 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF: CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | CLOSED REOPEN ADMIN ORD | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT REOPENED | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | RPN: MOTION AFTER DISPOSITION | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT REOPENED | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | RPN: MOTION AFTER DISPOSITION | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.