Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph A Pilotti Jr filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Probate Key West with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Koenig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseProbate Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition For Discharge Comments: (e) | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement Regarding Creditors Comments: (e) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Waiver of Accting & Serv of Pet For Dischg & recpt of Benef Comments: (e) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of No Estate Tax Due Comments: (e) | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Comments: (e) | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing Comments: (e) | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing Comments: (e) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Comments: TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX (jv) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time Comments: For Filing Inventory (jv) | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition To Extend Time For Filing Inventory Comments: (e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.