Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jean Junel Damis, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Derick Francis Kibler, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts County Civil Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions Non-Monetary (Residential) |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Of Dismissal * Comments: Order Of Dismissal For Lack Of Service (jv) | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CC - STATUS CONFERENCE - Kelley, Albert | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice * Comments: Setting Status Hearing (jv) April 3, 2023 @ 2.00 pm | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Of Service Comments: (Posted on 09/02/2022) | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued 6207451 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.