Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
David Norwood, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Tajammul Alamal, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts County Civil Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions Non-Monetary (Residential) |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served Comments: search unit & turned over to David Norwood, owner | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Of Possession Issued * | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Default FJ for Removal of Tenant (jv) | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Military/Non-Military Affidavit | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default Comments: issued (Against Tajammul Alamal) | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued 6203624 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.