Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Domingo J. Veloso Declaration Of Trust, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by David Van Loon, against Abraham Baker, Latrice Pla, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts County Civil Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions Non-Monetary (Residential) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil Key West |
Signed Summons 6186956 Comments: Abraham Baker
Date: August 15, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Filed 6186809
Date: August 15, 2022Military/Non-Military Affidavit 6186811
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution Issued * | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment For Possession | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Default for Entry by Clerk | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Default * Comments: Issued - Latrice Pla and Abraham Baker | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served Comments: 8/16/22 - Abraham Baker | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served Comments: 8/16/22 - Latrice Pla | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet Filed | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.