Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mariner'S Cove Apartments Associates Ltd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Kenneth Lowenhaupt, against Ward Hafner, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts County Civil Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions Non-Monetary (Residential) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil Key West |
Complaint 6133954
Date: July 12, 2022Summons Submitted for Issuance 6133952 Comments: Ward Hafner
Date: July 12, 2022Signed Summons 6134185 Comments: Ward Hafner
Date: July 12, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Filed 6133951
Date: July 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Of Dismissal * Comments: (jv) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CC - HEARING - Fowler, Peary S | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing Comments: (jv) August 4, 2022 @ 2.15 pm | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer * | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served Comments: 7/21/22 - Ward Hafner | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet Filed | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Submitted for Issuance Comments: Ward Hafner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.