Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bay Villas, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego case represented by Gregory Oropeza, against Affordable Renovations Claims Specialist, Llc, Glenn Harvey Williams, represented by Mitchell Cook, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Koenig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 20, 2022Summons Submitted for Issuance Comments: Glenn Harvey Williams
Date: September 20, 2022Signed Summons Comments: Glenn Harvey Williams
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Taking Deposition * | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Unavailability * Comments: Mitchell J Cook PA | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Service Of Interrogatories Comments: to the Defendant, Glenn Harvey Williams, D/B/A Ease Roofing (e) | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Service Of Interrogatories Comments: Plaintiff's (e) | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Request For Production * Comments: (e) | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.