Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reef Tropical Builders, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Alexander Barthet, against Live Oak Development, Llc, represented by Christopher Deem, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Koenig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryContract Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Complaint
Date: September 12, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 12, 2022Summons Submitted for Issuance
Date: September 12, 2022Request For Production * Comments: Pltf's First Request for Production to Dfnt
Date: September 12, 2022Request For Admissions Comments: Pltf's First Request for Admissions to Dfnt
Date: September 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: on Joint Stipulation for Dismissal (jv) | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Comments: Joint Stipulation for Entry of Final Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Strike * Comments: Dft's Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Agreed Scheduling Order (jv) | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer And Affirmative Defenses Comments: Dfnt's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Pltf's Complaint | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appearance * | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Service Comments: of Civil Case Management/Scheduling Order | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served Comments: 9/26/22 - Live Oak Development LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.