Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joann Flynn, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Manuel Garcia, against The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Koenig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryPremises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Civil Cover Sheet 6195510
Date: August 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report Comments: THE PARTIES REACHED AN AGREEMENT | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Comments: Notice of Mediation | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Preliminary General Civil Case Management/Scheduling Order (jv) | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served Comments: 9/2/22 - The Home Depot USA Inc | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Filing Over $100,000.00 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet 6195510 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.