Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Victor Alfonso Blass, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notes Comments: AP sent email to Defendant stating: "Around 3:15 we spoke over the phone. I noticed an issue in your case. You actually owe $256.00 for the case ending in 0831-A-P. Please note that the initial Court Disposition letter sent to you was incorrect as it stated that the amount due was $0. The Court minutes show that the Judge ordered adjudication withheld with fine of $150.00 and court cost of $106.00. As such, you owe a total of $256.00 for this ticket and $25.00 for case number 21-tr-000830-A-P." | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL - Albury, Joseph M (Actual: Albury, Joseph M) | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REQ FOR TRAF HEARING, NOT GUILTY PLEA | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Comments: COPY OF DL | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.