Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Uriel Borja, represented by Ted Hollander, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY * Comments: envelope | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Disposition Letter | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - TRAFFIC HEARING - Hamilton, Sharon (Actual: Hamilton, Sharon) | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE * Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY NOTICE TO PRODUCE AND APPEAR THE DEFENDANT REQUESTS A HEARING BEFORE A COUNTY COURT JUDGE PURSUANT TO TRAFFIC COURT RULE 6.630(N). [E] | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * 5457830 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.