Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ships Way Inc. Judy Shephard, President, filed a(n) Matter Involving Claims $5,001 - $8,000 case against Dorothy Naus D B A Dogs By The Sea, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Small Claims Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatter Involving Claims $5,001 - $8,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseSmall Claims Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Comments: Final (jv) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - SC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - Fowler, Peary S | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served Comments: 9/9/21 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Filing $8,000 or less | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement Of Claim (System Generated) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre Trial Notice Issued * Comments: ZOOM INFO WAS ATTACHED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notes * Comments: sent ptc to sheriff with check provided | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre Trial Notice Issued * 5730279 Comments: ZOOM INFO WAS ATTACHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.