Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Yvette Vargas Dba All Keys Marine& Auto, filed a(n) Matter Involving Claims $5,001 - $8,000 case against Mychael Kass Dba All Keys Marine& Auto, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Small Claims Marathon with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryMatter Involving Claims $5,001 - $8,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseSmall Claims Marathon |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving * Comments: Settlement Stipulation | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk to Close Case | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement * | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - SC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - Morgan, James | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre Trial Notice Issued * | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Directing Mediation | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Setting Mediation | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - SC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - Morgan, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.