Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jason Fry, represented by Anthony Stonick, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor - Ubc |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CANCELED-Pre-Trial Diversion MM - TRIAL BY COURT / CRIMINAL | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Pretrial Intervention / Diversion Agreement / Order | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION Comments: {E} | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER * Comments: ORDER SETTING TRIAL BY COURT [JV] | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER * Comments: ORDER SETTING TRIAL STATUS HEARING AND JURY SELECTION & DETERMINATION OF TRIAL BY JURY Thursday, March 16, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. {JV} | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion and Notice of Hearing Comments: MOTION FOR BENCH TRIAL AND CERTIFICATION UNDER FLA. STAT. 918.0157 [E] | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION Comments: [E] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.