Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Vince Shumate, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgement and Sentence | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT LIEN * | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGER PRINTS | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - ARRAIGNMENT - Fowler, Peary S | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CLOSED | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of App. Waiver of Argn. Writ Plea NG Dmd for Dis(MM,C | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY * Comments: Affid for Indigent Status-PD appt'd |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.