Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Daniel Jesus De La Cruz, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Key West with Mark Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING * | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DEFENDANT Comments: mtn for e/t of probation | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - ARRAIGNMENT - Wilson, Mark | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Surety Bond Posted 5731611 Comments: AS15K-354201 $10000/Bill Ryan Bail Bonds | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST FORM | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Review of Motor Vehicle and Property Records 5731621 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE * 5731626 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE FORM 5731616 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * 5731926 Comments: AEU4ZYE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.