Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asa filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Oscar Echevarria, represented by Mark Turbessi, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST * Comments: FOR WARRANT DISMISSAL | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Recalled VOP Warrant | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Reclose | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Issued VOP Warrant | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - STATUS CONFERENCE - Hamilton, Sharon (Actual: Hamilton, Sharon) | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Sentencing Court Minutes | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.