Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asa filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Veronica Nicole Corrales, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROS ALL COUNTS Comments: N O L L E P R O S E Q U I(E) | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Sentencing Court Minutes | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - DOCKET SOUNDING - Hamilton, Sharon | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROS ALL COUNTS | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - MM - ARRAIGNMENT - Hamilton, Sharon | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CANCELED-Other MM - ARRAIGNMENT - Hamilton, Sharon | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.