Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Samuel Kaufman, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Michael George Haggerty, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Family Key West with Leon Firtel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeon Firtel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2011 |
CategoryRepeat Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseFamily Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Repeat Violence | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING - DR - INJUNCTION - Firtel, Leon | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING - DR - ALL INJUCTION HEARINGS - Garcia, Luis | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Ext Temp Injunction Repeat Violence | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Order * | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notes * | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Order * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.