Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James Whitley, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego case represented by Lissie Salazar, against Michael Haggerty, Juana Maria Haggerty, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Leon Firtel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeon Firtel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2011 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter * 3047275 Comments: from Plft James Whitley | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter * 2856890 Comments: to James Whitley | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Judgment 2723119 Comments: against Defendant Juana Maria Haggerty | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Denying * 2723026 Comments: Plaintiffs counsel's motion to withdraw | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's * 2723113 Comments: notice of voluntary dismissal of one, two, four and five of his five count complaint | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 2723029 Comments: 12/4/14 | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's * 2723116 Comments: motion for Final Judgment against Defendant Juana Maria Haggerty | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Civil Jury Trial - Firtel, Leon | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Hearing - Firtel, Leon | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Pre Trial Conference - Firtel, Leon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.