Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express Natl Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Fagen, Jessica Jo, against Aronin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by American Express National Bank against the defendant, Michael Aronin, in the County Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract and account stated. The plai...
Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 10-24-2023 AT 1:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Aronin Michael |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2990216 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JO RAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065 ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/10/2021 REGISTER#:299 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3020028 AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JO RAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065 ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $400.00 $400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/09/2021 REGISTER#:302 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.