Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Jeffrey L, against Lewis, Victor D, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint document appears to contain a lot of noise and invalid text from the extraction process. It is difficult to summarize the text accurately in three paragraphs due to the lack of coherent information. I apologize for the inconvenience.
Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Order Extending Time for
Date: August 09, 2023Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for 60DYS FOR SERVICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
FWOP Notice 09-12-2023 AT 9:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned - No Service Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2990282 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KAHN, JEFFREY LEE PO BOX 934788 MARGATE FL 33093-4788 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/10/2021 REGISTER#:299 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lewis Victor D |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.