Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Newlife Healthcare & Wellness Center, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carla C. Martinez, against Progressive Express Insurance Company, represented by Millon, Andres, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Newlife Healthcare & Wellness Center on behalf of Debbie Cooper Wilson against Progressive Express Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages and seeks declaratory relief. The action is brought under the Florida Motor...
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2021Complaint
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2980053 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CARLA C. MARTINEZ 2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOOR COCONUT GOVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2021 REGISTER#:298 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 8. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.