Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vilafortuny Salou Medical Center, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Yulexy Solis Garcia, against Geico Indemnity Company, represented by Torres, Albert A, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Vilafortuny Salou Medical Center, Inc. on behalf of Yulie Abreus against Geico Indemnity Company. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by Geico Indemnity Company in relation to a motor vehicle accident that occurred o...
Complaint
Date: September 06, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: September 20, 2022Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SATISFACTION OF LIEN FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REGARDING Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: ON PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT S Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT S RESPONSE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine RELATING TO FRAUD IN ANY RESPECT Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.