Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Del Risco, Jose M, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Salcines, Jackie A., Salcines, Jacqueline A., Esq, against Gutierrez, Patricia, Tenorio, Nathaniel A, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed under Filing # 134126706 and was e-filed on September 7, 2021, at 04:18:18 PM. The text does not provide any specific information about the nature of the complaint or the parties involved. Therefore, it is not possible to summ...
Amended Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Motion for Garnishment
Date: November 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT(AFTER JUDGMENT) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 01-23-23@1:30PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 31, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT O F GARNISHMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 10-31-22@9:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Garnishment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: TENORIO NATHANIEL A; GUTIERREZ PATRICIA |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Amount Due and Owning Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment In Garnishment PLAINTIFF Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.