Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Diaz, Concepcion, Diaz, Cristobal, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Diego, Ramon J., against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Goldblum, Jesse Miles, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Cristobal Diaz and Concepcion Diaz against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by the defendant. The plaintiffs were residents of Miami-Dade County, Florida, while the defendant...
Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: April 02, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: DANIA.BATTLE@CSKLEGAL.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance INCORRECT CASE NUMBER. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.