Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
New Generation Medical Center, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gregory E Gudin, against Progressive American Insurance Company, represented by Myers, Hollanders L., Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by New Generation Medical Center, Inc. on behalf of Carolina Paredes against Progressive American Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract for damages in excess of $8,000.01 but not exceeding $15,000. The pl...
Complaint
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 18, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: January 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3010034 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2021 REGISTER#:301 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.