Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbosa, Marisol, Unified Medical, Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Tenenbaum, Jason, Esq, against Geico Insurance Company, represented by Soto-Ortega, Nicole, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Order:
Date: February 24, 2022Voluntary Dismissal
Date: July 26, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: February 22, 2022Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: November 16, 2021Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: September 13, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 13, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: September 03, 2021Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: July 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING EX PARTE ORDER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Request to Produce Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.