Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Prieto, Christopher, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by Sygman, Forrest, against Scola, Theresa Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: January 17, 2022Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Scola Theresa Michelle |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Scola Theresa Michelle |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Scola Theresa Michelle |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2940165 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SYGMAN, FORREST 7300 N KENDALL DR STE 450 MIAMI FL 33155 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2021 REGISTER#:294 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.