Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Martinez, Maria, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gabriel Manuel Sanchez, against City Of Coral Gables, represented by Salazar, David, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Motion:
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Production
Date: April 08, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO BE NOTIFIED OF ELECTIVE SURGERY. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.