Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reyes, Hildebrando, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mourin, Juan, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Soriano, Melissa, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Request for Admissions
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 07, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition JUAN CHAU OF CHAU Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.