Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stokes, Edward, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Borshchukov Vyacheslav, against Association, Inc., Florida Insurance Guarantee, represented by Rachel H. Minetree, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Complaint
Date: September 06, 2021Order of Default
Date: November 02, 2021Order on Case Management Plan
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT CHECKS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- DATE: AUGUST 22ND, 2023 TIME: 7:30 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF ENTITLEMENT TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES AND COURT COSTS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- APRIL 20, 2023. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.