Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alfonso, Carlos, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case represented by J H Zidell, against Caremax Inc., Clinica Las Americas, Inc., Rodriguez, Luis L, represented by Lang, Chad, O'Quinn, Ryan Dwight, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Complaint
Date: September 06, 2021Order Extending Time for
Date: October 02, 2021Settlement Agreement
Date: October 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Clinica Las Americas Inc.; CareMax Inc.; Rodriguez Luis L |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: FOR APPROVAL OF PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Lang Chad; O'quinn Ryan Dwight; Clinica Las Americas Inc.; CareMax Inc.; Rodriguez Luis L |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned LUIS L. RODRIGUEZ. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CAREMAX INC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned CLINICA LAS AMERICAS, INC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2940005 AMT PAID:$40.00 NAME:J H ZIDELL 300 71ST ST STE 605 MIAMI BEACH FL 33141-3089 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2021 REGISTER#:294 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.