Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allertech Laboratories, Inc, Allgenic Health And Wellness, Inc., Rigdon, Randall B., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lewis J Levey, against L&J Pediatrics, P.A., Randall B. Rigdon Llc, represented by Morla, Pablo B, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness ($15,001 - $30,000) |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Allgenic Health and Wellness, Inc. against Randall B. Rigdon LLC and Randall B. Rigdon. The complaint alleges multiple counts, including breach of contract, breach of personal guarantee, account stated, open account, and un...
Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 22, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: L&J Pediatrics P.A. |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AND APPROVING STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: L&J Pediatrics P.A. |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AND APPROVING STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 10/14/2022 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.