Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Coex Coffee International Inc, Philip Von Kahle, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Eugene E Stearns, Graham, Matthew M, Jonathan S Feldman, against Alvarez, Ernesto, Cargill, Inc., Romero, Ernesto, represented by Bellido, Nelson C., Jimenez, Marcos D., Keenan, Paul Joseph, Jr, William V Roppolo, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Complaint
Date: July 01, 2021Order:
Date: February 09, 2022Notice:
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 07, 2022Notice:
Date: February 04, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 01, 2022Response:
Date: January 24, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: December 20, 2021Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: September 29, 2021Order:
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: July 06, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 15, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 09, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 10, 2021Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Date: September 01, 2021Response:
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 02, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: July 01, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: February 02, 2022Response to Motion
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 12, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: May 18, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 01, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 10, 2021Notice:
Date: September 24, 2021Request for Production
Date: December 23, 2021Order:
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 07, 2022Stipulation
Date: July 30, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 01, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: August 27, 2021Motion to Transfer
Date: July 02, 2021Response to Motion
Date: September 29, 2021Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:
Date: July 21, 2021(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 30, 2021Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Date: September 10, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 15, 2021Notice:
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Hrg Special Appt
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 27, 2023Response to Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: June 13, 2022Request for Production
Date: August 16, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: June 13, 2022Motion to Transfer
Date: June 02, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: August 16, 2022Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: June 22, 2022Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Romero Ernesto |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Graham Matthew M; Philip von Kahle |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF FIRM AFFILIATION CHANGE. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production SECOND Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.