Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Machado, Exilda, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Hernandez, Raizel, against Auto Club Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Jolicoeur, Isabel, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Request for Production
Date: June 30, 2021Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 14, 2022Voluntary Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2022Settlement Agreement
Date: February 03, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Hrg Special Appt
Date: January 11, 2022Motion:
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Hrg Special Appt
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: February 03, 2022Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: June 30, 2021Privilege Log
Date: September 20, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: March 10, 2022Cancellation Notice
Date: February 03, 2022(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 02, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 30, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 20, 2021Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: September 21, 2021Request:
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 09, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Filing:
Date: September 24, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 09, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 06, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: December 21, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: September 16, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: October 18, 2021Motion:
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hrg Special Appt Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.