Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morrison Express Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Reiner, Samuel B., Ii, against Biotechinnova, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Final Judgment
Date: October 22, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: January 28, 2022Motion to Show Cause
Date: February 04, 2022(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 01, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: December 02, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: November 04, 2021Service Returned
Date: August 06, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: February 25, 2022Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 09, 2022Default Final Judgment
Date: October 24, 2021Subpoena Served
Date: January 07, 2022Motion for Garnishment
Date: January 05, 2022Subpoena Served
Date: March 01, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 05, 2022Motion for Default
Date: September 28, 2021Writ of Garnishment Issued
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 29, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 30, 2021Default
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 11, 2022Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed
Date: February 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause ON MARCH 28, 2022 AT 9:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served LIFEMEDZ LC C/O KURT WEDDERBURN Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served AT&T WIRELESS SUBPOENA COMPLIANCE CENTER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer of Garnishee Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Herron Andrew Ross; Jp Morgan Chase Bank N A |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MARCH 7, 2022. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Show Cause Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.