Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Young 3250 Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Marc A Wites, against Heritage Property & Casaulty Insurance Company, represented by Michelle Diverio, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Notice:
Date: October 18, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Heritage Property & Casaulty Insurance Company |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Heritage Property & Casaulty Insurance Company |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FINAL ORDER AS TO ALL PARTIES SRS #: 12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition JANUARY 25, 2022 AT 10:00AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF'S Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Served BRAD PRIDEMORE, PINNACLE CLAIM SERVICES, INC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF'S Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.