Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Graham, Charles, Graham, Sondra, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Daniel J Rodriguez, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Salehi, Tanaz, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: July 01, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Graham Sondra; Graham Charles |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.