Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arbour Townhouse Condominium Association, Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Amy E Ruiz, against American Coastal Insurance Company, represented by Mishali, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Amended Answer
Date: April 08, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: March 09, 2022Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 06, 2022Agreed Order
Date: January 21, 2022Motion for Relief from Judgment
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 13, 2022Motion for Relief from Judgment
Date: April 19, 2022Notice Or Stipulation Designating Mediator
Date: February 16, 2022Agreed Order
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 14, 2022Privilege Log
Date: March 16, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 04, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2022Motion for Relief from Judgment
Date: March 18, 2022Email Notice with Party
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 26, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 19, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: January 21, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 24, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 12, 2021Exhibit List
Date: February 28, 2022Request for Production
Date: December 20, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: December 20, 2021Motion for Relief from Judgment
Date: February 28, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 28, 2022Agreed Order
Date: May 03, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: May 04, 2022Order:
Date: March 31, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 11, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 21, 2022Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 20, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Filing:
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Taking Video Deposition
Date: April 12, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 25, 2021Agreed Order
Date: August 30, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: November 15, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 20, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: February 24, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 29, 2021ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: July 20, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: July 09, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 23, 2021Notice:
Date: November 10, 2021Complaint
Date: June 30, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 14, 2022Stipulation and Order Substituting Counsel
Date: August 16, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 24, 2021Witness List
Date: February 28, 2022Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 02, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 11, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: November 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- HEARING SET FOR 6/23/22 AT 9:30 AM. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses PLNTF'S. REPLY IN AVOIDANCE OF DEF'S. AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation Conference Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Relief from Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.