Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Denis, Louisa, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rubinstein, Moshe, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Julissa Nethersole, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: February 15, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: December 02, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition AMENDED Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.