Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aponte, Wilson Jesus, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Carbone, Anthony P., against Garcia, Simeon, Garcia, Simeon Rafael, represented by Edward K Cottrell, Pines, Ricardo E., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: September 21, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice NOVEMBER 12, 2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: GARCIA SIMEON |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- SPECIAL SET HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 15 MINS ON 11-12-2021 @ 11:15 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- 11/12/2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Pines Ricardo E.; GARCIA SIMEON |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance EMAIL: PLEADINGS@REPINESPA.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.