Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gedeon, Rosemanette, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gabriel Mazzitelli, against 13705 Opa Locka, Llc, North Miami Caraf, Inc, represented by Mark R Antonelli Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: March 10, 2022Certificate of No Objections to Production
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral CALENDAR CALL 10/13/2022 1:30PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel ON DEFENDANT, 13705 OPA LOCKA, LLC MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- . Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.