Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Epifania, Maria I, Herrera, Paola M, Mantrana, Susana, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gutierrez, Gustavo A., against Blandon, Vanessa C, Esquijarosa, Dignora, represented by Banos Machado, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA05 - Downtown Miami presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCA05 - Downtown Miami Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryRpmf -Other Action |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Notice of Appearance
Date: September 09, 2021Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AS COUNSEL Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Banos Machado Javier; Esquijarosa Dignora; Blandon Vanessa C |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Esquijarosa Dignora |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Blandon Vanessa C |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3020130 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GUTIERREZ, GUSTAVO A. 11402 NW 41ST ST STE 202 MIAMI FL 33178-4861 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/04/2021 REGISTER#:302 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3020131 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GUTIERREZ, GUSTAVO A. 11402 NW 41ST ST STE 202 MIAMI FL 33178-4861 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/04/2021 REGISTER#:302 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Esquijarosa Dignora |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Blandon Vanessa C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.