Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Serfaty, Alberto, Sp Flia Corp, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Williams, Stephanie Puente, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Alvarez, Alina M, Steven J Chackman, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Notice of Interrogatory
Date: July 01, 2021Witness List
Date: March 15, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: March 01, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2021Notice:
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 02, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: September 13, 2021Email Notice:
Date: March 08, 2022Certificate of No Objections to Production
Date: May 05, 2022Email Notice:
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Production
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Filing:
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Production
Date: July 02, 2021Witness List
Date: March 01, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Discovery
Date: July 02, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 05, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 22, 2021Notice Or Stipulation Designating Mediator
Date: January 07, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 05, 2022Exhibit List
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: July 01, 2021Witness List
Date: February 17, 2022Order:
Date: September 14, 2021Notice:
Date: September 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 24, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: September 10, 2021Notice:
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 28, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: September 29, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: November 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 11, 2021Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: June 11, 2021(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 01, 2021Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 13, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 24, 2021Agreed Order
Date: July 15, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: SCHACKMAN@BERNSTEIN-CHACKMAN.COM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.